Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Howard County Library System to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and bargain collectively through a representative; requiring the library system and the certified exclusive representative to enter into a collective bargaining agreement that contains provisions regarding specified matters; requiring the library system to submit specified terms of the collective bargaining agreement to the Board of Library Trustees for Howard County for its acceptance or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-6)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 42
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Finance 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (38-6) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-601 through 23-614 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM