Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Small Businesses - Student Interns and Apprentices
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Buckel, Corderman, Hornberger, Krebs, Malone, McComas, Reilly, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that hire high school or college interns or apprentices under certain circumstances; providing that the credit may not exceed $7,500 for any taxable year; requiring a small business to submit certain documentation to qualify for the credit; providing that certain organizations exempt from taxation may receive the credit as a refund under certain circumstances; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Small Businesses - Student Interns and Apprentices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Small Businesses - Student Interns and Apprentices
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM