Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $15,000 to $25,000 the maximum amount in controversy in a civil action in which a party may not demand a jury trial; providing for the construction and prospective application of the Act; and making the Act contingent on the passage and ratification of a certain constitutional amendment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0670
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0727 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment and on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {802412/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-34)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {802412/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (104-34) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 5:56 PM
Click to return on the top page