Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Miller
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the authority, powers, and duties of officers and employees of the Field Enforcement Division in the Office of the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission over certain matters; substituting references to the Division and the Commission, respectively, for references to the Comptroller in certain provisions relating to alcohol and tobacco; requiring the Commission and the Comptroller to cooperate in sharing of certain information and personnel in certain inspections and other activities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0911
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973192/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {973192/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49B
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-304, 1-313 through 1-315, 1-317, 1-321, 4-109, 6-101, 6-103, 6-105, 6-107, 6-108, 6-202, 6-203, 6-204, 6-205, 6-308, 6-328 )
(   3-101, 3-201 )
(   2-102, 2-103, 2-105, 2-107 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:11 PM