Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appoint five members, instead of three, to the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; requiring that members be appointed from each legislative district in Anne Arundel County; limiting the number of terms that a member of the Board may serve to four consecutive terms; staggering the terms of members of the Board; altering certain requirements for political diversity among members of the Board; authorizing the Board, rather than the Governor, to designate a chair of the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0487
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page