Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett (By Request - Anne Arundel County Administration)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a special fund to be used only to fund the Annapolis Art in Public Places Commission; requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a certain fund for housing assistance payments; requiring the Commission to report by November 1 each year on its use of the hotel tax revenue during the preceding fiscal year to the Mayor and the City Council and to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {425360/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {649237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {425360/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {649237/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page