Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Brooks, and Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain businesses that collect a consumer's personal information to provide certain notices to the consumer at or before the point of collection; authorizing a consumer to submit a certain request for information to a certain business that collects the consumer's personal information; requiring a certain business to comply with a certain request for information in a certain manner and within 45 days after receiving a verifiable consumer request; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Online Consumer Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Online Consumer Protection Act
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4201 through 14-4214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM