Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the amount in controversy in civil proceedings in which the right to a jury trial may be limited by legislation from more than $15,000 to more than $25,000; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0669
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0726 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {922419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {922419/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 5:57 PM
Click to return on the top page