Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 780
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the parking of a disabled, inoperable, or immobilized vehicle on a public street for more than 7 days in Washington County; requiring that certain notice be posted on a vehicle parked in violation of the Act prior to towing the vehicle; requiring that certain notice be provided following the impounding of a vehicle under the Act; establishing a certain penalty of up to $500; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0847
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 780
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 780
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1004, 25-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM