Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Bridges
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible student" to include a student who is a first-year student not receiving federal or State financial aid and is enrolled directly in a registered apprenticeship program that partners with a public community college in the State to be eligible for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0845
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {654968/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {224738/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text - Chapter - Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page