Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, the Secretary of Labor to waive the charges of unemployment insurance benefits against the earned rating record of an employing unit for claims filed during a certain period of time that the Secretary determines to be related to COVID-19; authorizing the Secretary to charge certain unemployment insurance benefits against the earned rating record of an employing unit due to certain conduct related to separation notices; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2025.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0814
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/3/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page