Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Basis (2nd Lieutenant Richard Collins, III's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson, Acevero, Arikan, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Charles, D.E. Davis, D.M. Davis, Fennell, W. Fisher, Grammer, Harrison, Healey, Henson, Holmes, Ivey, M. Jackson, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lopez, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Wilkins, Williams, Clippinger, Cardin, Cox, Crutchfield, Griffith, Malone, McComas, Moon, Pippy, and Shetty
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the basis on which a person is prohibited from taking certain actions against a certain person or group, to include certain actions motivated either in whole or in part by another person's or group's race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, or national origin, or because another person or group is homeless.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0606
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {442113/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Basis (2nd Lieutenant Richard Collins, III's Law)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {442113/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Basis (2nd Lieutenant Richard Collins, III's Law)
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Basis (2nd Lieutenant Richard Collins, III's Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:11 PM