Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Underrepresented Teachers
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Underrepresented Teachers; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to assist in the repayment of a certain loan owed by certain eligible individuals; requiring the Office to determine the annual amount of certain assistance; requiring a certain amount of assistance to equal at least 12.5% of the higher education loan attributable to tuition, fees, books and materials; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Underrepresented Teachers
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   18-3701 through 18-3705 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page