Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Plans - Development and Adoption
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Afzali, Anderton, Barkley, Beidle, Beitzel, Carr, Cassilly, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Krebs, Krimm, Lam, Lisanti, Mautz, McIntosh, McMillan, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, S. Robinson, Shoemaker, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, A. Washington, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the legislative body of a local jurisdiction to adopt, modify, remand or disapprove a specified plan or part of a plan, a plan for one or more geographic sections or divisions of the local jurisdiction, or an amendment to the plan; authorizing and requiring the legislative body to hold a public hearing before taking specified actions; requiring a planning commission to hold a public hearing before submitting a new recommended plan under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0551
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670814/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {670814/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-204, 3-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM