Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell and Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified action to be brought to establish title against adverse claims to property; providing for venue and the application of the Maryland Rules in an action under the Act; establishing requirements for a complaint, an answer to a complaint, naming of defendants, joinder of parties, and service of process in an action under the Act; requiring the recording in the land records of the county in which any portion of the property is located of a judgement in an action under the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0509
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1129 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {880810/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {713825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {880810/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {478876/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {713825/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-108, 14-601 through 14-621 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM