Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the eligibility of certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System for certain death benefits when COVID-19 caused or contributed to the death of a member; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to accept the death of a member as arising out of or in the course of the actual performance of duty under certain circumstances; requiring the Board, under certain circumstances, to discontinue payment of a certain allowance and begin payment of a certain special death benefit allowance; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114666/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {114666/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 5:24 PM
Click to return on the top page