Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsored by
Delegate Arikan
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain owner of a mobile home park to provide written notice of any increase in the annual rent for a site to a certain resident, a certain homeowners association, and the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General at least 90 days before the effective date of the increase; authorizing an increase in annual rent to exceed an increase in a certain index only under certain circumstances; requiring a park owner to schedule a certain meeting and provide certain information; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1005 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 8:01 PM
Click to return on the top page