Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Imposing a tax of 17% on the Maryland taxable income attributable to certain investment management services of an individual or a corporation or the distributive share of a pass-through entity; providing that the tax does not apply to investment management services if at least 80% of the specified assets consists of real estate; terminating the Act if certain federal legislation is enacted into law; applying the Act to taxable years 2019 and beyond; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-102.1, 10-102.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM