Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue from certain digital products to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; defining "digital product" as one that is obtained by the buyer or delivered electronically; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; providing that the retail sale of a certain digital code or digital product shall be presumed to be made in the state in which a certain customer tax address is located; stating the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 21st–Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {755867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {603824/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (44-93)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {453527/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Love) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (53-84)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 21st–Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-47)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {143328/1 (Senator Hershey)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {143328/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-45)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - 21st–Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {755867/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 44
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {603824/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (44-93) 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {453527/1 (Delegate Szeliga) 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Love) Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (53-84) 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - 21st–Century Economy Sales Tax Act
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (87-47) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {599536/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {143328/1 (Senator Hershey) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {143328/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30) 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (89-45) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-219 )
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-103, 11-217, 11-221, 2-1302.1 )
Last Updated: 10/13/2020 4:35 PM