Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ticket reseller from selling or offering to sell speculative tickets unless the reseller makes certain disclosures; and requiring a reseller to refund a certain deposit or other consideration within 10 days after the event for which the tickets were sold under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113397/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {113397/1 Adopted 50
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-310, 13-310.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM