Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison and Patterson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain civil penalties the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights is authorized to seek if the Commission finds that a respondent has engaged in a discriminatory act under certain provisions of law regarding public accommodations and persons licensed or regulated by a certain unit in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that certain maximum penalty amounts do not apply if a certain discriminatory act is determined to be malicious; requiring certain civil penalties to be paid to a certain complainant; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0823
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1016, 20-304, 20-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM