Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Platt, Miele, Anderton, Barron, Cullison, Gilchrist, Hayes, Jacobs, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McCray, McDonough, Metzgar, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Shoemaker, Sydnor, Vallario, A. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a notary public to perform notarial acts electronically; requiring a specified notary public to register with the Secretary of State before performing specified electronic notarizations; requiring the Secretary to develop a specified registration form for an electronic notary; requiring an electronic notary to reregister with the Secretary under specified circumstances; specifying requirements for electronic notarizations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0747
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-104 )
(   18-101, 18-201 through 18-208, 19-103, 19-109, 19-110, 19-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM