Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing sports wagering license holders to accept wagers on sporting events by certain methods and in certain locations; requiring certain fantasy competition operators to register with the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission before offering fantasy competition or services; authorizing the Commission to impose a fee for the registration of an operator; establishing the Small, Minority-Owned, and Women-Owned Business Sports Wagering Assistance Fund to assist certain businesses entering the sports wagering market; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {365361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-10)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion to withdraw Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {655467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {365361/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Patterson) Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Floor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-10) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {559730/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zucker) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Reconsider Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion to withdraw Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Substitute Committee Amendment {655467/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text - Chapter - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
(   9-1A-01,   9-1A-03,   9-1A-33,   9-1A-36,   9-1D-01,   9-1D-02, 9-1D-03, 9-1D-04, 9-1D-05, 9-1E-01 through 9-1E-16 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2021 11:37 AM
Click to return on the top page