Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing sports wagering license holders to accept wagers on sporting events by certain methods and in certain locations; requiring certain fantasy competition operators to register with the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission before the operator may offer fantasy competition or services; authorizing the Commission to impose a fee for the registration of an operator; establishing the Sports Wagering Application Review Commission to review applications for licenses and evaluate certain race-neutral programs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {365361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-10)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {365361/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Patterson) Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Floor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-10) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {559730/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
(   9-1A-01,   9-1A-03,   9-1A-33,   9-1D-01,   9-1D-02, 9-1D-03, 9-1D-04, 9-1D-05, 9-1E-01 through 9-1E-15 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page