Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified political subdivisions to require periodic inspections of multifamily dwellings with specified balcony railings at least once every 5 years to ensure that each balcony railing meets the requirements of the applicable local housing code or the Minimum Livability Code; prohibiting Baltimore City from issuing or renewing a specified multiple-family dwelling license unless the applicant demonstrates that a professional inspector has completed a specified inspection; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0469 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {370119/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {713627/1 Rejected (42-89)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {433123/1 Rejected (43-91)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334339/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Delegates Stein, Holmes, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senators Young, Benson, and Ferguson
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {370119/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {713627/1 Rejected (42-89) 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate McDermott) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {433123/1 Rejected (43-91) 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {334339/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Delegates Stein, Holmes, and Fraser-Hidalgo 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senators Young, Benson, and Ferguson 60
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM