Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Anderton, Frush, and Jalisi
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing waste or recycling collection vehicles to be equipped with or display yellow or amber lights or signal devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {578370/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM