Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, R. Lewis, A. Miller, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning to examine, to consider options for improving, and to make recommendations regarding efforts to educate residents of the State about planning for long-term care; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0696
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {976287/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {976287/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {727474/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text - Chapter - Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM