Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish procedures that require a foreclosure purchaser to send to the Department any updates to the information about or relating to the foreclosure purchaser that was submitted in the initial registration of a residential property with the Foreclosed Property Registry; and requiring the Department, for each registered residential property, to send to specified local governments a copy of the initial registration and notice of any updated information received by the Department; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700515/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {933026/1 (Senator Norman)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {933026/1 (Senator Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {700515/1 Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 36
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {718178/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Muse) Adopted 59
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {933026/1 (Senator Norman) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Kelley) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {933026/1 (Senator Norman) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-126.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM