Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Hill, Johnson, and Queen
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, to provide coverage for any medically appropriate drugs that are approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of hepatitis C, regardless of the fibrosis score, and that are determined to be medically necessary.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396081/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {396081/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM