Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Grounds for Suspension
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Smith, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing executive secretary of the Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners to immediately suspend a certain alcoholic beverages license if the secretary has certain reason to believe that the license holder has failed to take reasonable measures to prevent an act of violence that may result in death or serious bodily injury, or a recurrence of an act of violence that resulted in death or serious bodily injury, from occurring on the licensed premises or on certain property immediately adjacent to the licensed premises; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Grounds for Suspension
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903891/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Grounds for Suspension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Grounds for Suspension
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {903891/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Grounds for Suspension
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-2101, 12-2105, 4-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM