Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Arentz, Chang, Clark, Ghrist, Jacobs, Malone, McDonough, Metzgar, Saab, Sophocleus, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of specified security breach investigation and notification requirements to specified businesses; authorizing a specified business to elect to provide a specified notification; prohibiting a specified business from charging a specified business a fee for providing information needed to provide a specified notification or requiring or compelling a specified business to make a specified election; prohibiting a specified business from using specified information for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633593/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {633593/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-3504, 14-3507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM