Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Frush, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Public School Facility Construction Innovation Incentive Pilot Program to provide incentives to encourage public school systems to pursue innovative public school facility construction projects; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement, administer, and promote the Program; requiring the Committee to approve a project that meets a certain cost threshold for participation in the Program; providing that a public school participant may use other types of financing or bidding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654462/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {654462/1 Adopted 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text - Chapter - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM