Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, J. Lewis, Crosby, Crutchfield, D.E. Davis, M. Fisher, Jackson, Kelly, Malone, Moon, Turner, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the maximum amounts of certain compensation awardable by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; authorizing the Board to negotiate a settlement with a person that has provided certain funeral or death-related services; altering the time within which a claimant is required to file a claim for compensation from the Board; authorizing a claimant to file a claim with the Board electronically in a certain manner; prohibiting certain persons from engaging in certain debt collection activities under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0672
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {862517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {862517/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Text - Chapter - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-809, 11-811, 11-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM