Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Jones, Hettleman, Korman, Lam, Tarlau, M. Washington, Walker, A. Washington, Turner, C. Howard, Patterson, P. Young, Holmes, Vallario, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program to award competitive grants to institutions of higher education to develop and implement programs that provide inclusive higher education opportunities for students with intellectual and developmental disabilities; requiring the Program to be administered by the Maryland Higher Education Commission in consultation with specified entities; requiring the Commission to submit an annual report on the program's effectiveness beginning June 30, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0872
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {715465/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-27)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {715465/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (111-27) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1201 through 11-1205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM