Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson, Hettleman, Lopez, Moon, Shetty, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse"; altering the statute of limitations in certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse by providing that a certain action may be filed at any time; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2020, if the action is filed before October 1, 2022; and repealing a statute of repose for certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0687 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 11:34 AM