Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Carr, and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish certain standards for State buildings to minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring each building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the Department to meet the standards to the extent practicable; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing public buildings in a certain manner; and requiring the Secretary of General Services to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1009
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM