Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegate Gilchrist
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the use of qualified conservation in a forest mitigation bank of all or a part of certain existing forests as a standard for meeting certain afforestation or reforestation requirements; altering the defined term "forest mitigation banking" as it applies to the Forest Conservation Act to include the qualified conservation of forests; requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology, in consultation with certain units of State government and the Chesapeake Bay Program, to conduct a certain technical study; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {570516/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Forest Mitigation Banks - Qualified Conservation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-8)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {953823/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-38)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources – Forest Mitigation Banks – Qualified Preservation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {570516/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Forest Mitigation Banks - Qualified Conservation
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (127-8) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {594438/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Floor Amendment {953823/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-38) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Passed Enrolled
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page