Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0994 - 2019RS
   CH0008 - 2020RS
Title
Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Acevero, Barron, Boyce, Bridges, Brooks, Charles, W. Fisher, Holmes, Ivey, Lierman, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Turner, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 8 of 2020
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers who employ 15 or more full-time employees from requiring an applicant for employment, before the first in-person interview, to disclose certain information regarding the criminal record of the applicant except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to conduct an investigation to determine whether the Act has been violated on receipt of a written complaint of an applicant or employee; authorizing the Commissioner to assess a certain civil penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0839
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333791/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-37)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, Crosby and C. Watson)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, Crosby and C. Watson)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Augustine, Hayes and Benson)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Augustine, Hayes and Benson)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {543529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {543529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (95-42)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 8 of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {333791/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-37) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {747070/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, Crosby and C. Watson) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, Crosby and C. Watson) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Augustine, Hayes and Benson) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Augustine, Hayes and Benson) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Conference Committee Report {543529/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Conference Committee Report {543529/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (95-42)
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (31-15)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 8 of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103, 3-1401 through 3-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 11:33 AM