Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Anderton, Arentz, Bagnall, Beitzel, Crosby, Hartman, Jacobs, R. Lewis, Mautz, McKay, Morgan, Otto, Proctor, Rosenberg, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring oversight of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants from the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department, by July 1, 2021, and each July 1 thereafter, to submit a report to the General Assembly on the number of eligible physicians and physician assistants who applied for and participated in the Program that includes certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0501
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1701, 24-1701 through 24-1706, 24-1702, 24-1704, 24-1705, 24-1706, 24-1707 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 11:58 AM