Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Jacobs, Mautz, McKay, Otto, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a process for an electric cooperative to operate as a member-regulated cooperative in a certain area; specifying that the Public Service Commission does not have jurisdiction over a member-regulated cooperative, subject to certain exceptions; prohibiting a member-regulated cooperative from exercising a certain power of condemnation for the sole purpose of providing broadband Internet service; specifying certain provisions of law that apply to a member-regulated cooperative; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693896/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {693896/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {677073/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 11:57 AM