Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby and Acevero
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State House Trust to ensure that the grounds and structures of Lawyer's Mall, including the statue of Thurgood Marshall, are maintained in the same material condition in which they existed on July 1, 2018; providing that the grounds and structures of Lawyer's Mall may be altered as necessary for repair only under certain conditions; prohibiting the Trust from approving the addition of structures to Lawyer's Mall that were not present on July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-502, 9-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM