Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Jacobs, Mautz, McKay, Otto, and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a process for an electric cooperative to operate as a member-regulated cooperative in a certain area; requiring a cooperative's board of directors to hold a certain meeting and forums and provide a certain notice and information to the cooperative's members on whether to operate as a member-regulated cooperative; requiring a member-regulated cooperative to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the status of the deployment of broadband Internet service to the cooperative's members; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693896/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {693896/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {677073/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Text - Chapter - Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
(   5-601, 5-607, 5-632, 5-635, 5-635 through 5-644, 5-647 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:15 PM
Click to return on the top page