Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Conaway, Cox, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Dumais, W. Fisher, Glenn, Guyton, Hettleman, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Shetty, Stewart, Sydnor, Turner, R. Watson, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Commissioner of Correction from prohibiting an inmate placed in restrictive housing from having access to a transitional coordinator or case manager within 180 days before the direct release of the inmate from a correctional facility to the community.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {152416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {658971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {152416/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {658971/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-614, 9-614.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page