Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, D.E. Davis, and Lisanti
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the owner of a rental vehicle may satisfy a certain insurance requirement by maintaining a certain security that is secondary to any other valid and collectible coverage under certain circumstances and subject to a certain exception; providing that security maintained by the owner of a rental vehicle or replacement vehicle is primary under certain circumstances; requiring the owner of a rental vehicle to provide a certain notice to the renter of the rental vehicle; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0436
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373899/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-26)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-23)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {373899/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (104-26) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules 58
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {667274/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-23) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-103, 17-104, 17-104.3, 18-102, 18-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM