Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, J. Lewis, Arikan, Atterbeary, Carr, Cox, Dumais, W. Fisher, Hettleman, Hill, Luedtke, McComas, Moon, Solomon, Terrasa, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to ensure that every child in the State has access to a child advocacy center; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to contract with an organization that meets certain requirements to establish a Maryland Statewide Organization for Child Advocacy Centers; requiring the money for child advocacy centers to be distributed in a certain manner and to be used to supplement, not supplant, funds for the program from other sources; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0739
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {438579/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {994964/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {438579/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text - Chapter - Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM