Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the hiring of a certain emergent employee by a county board of education or nonpublic school for a period not to exceed 60 days under certain conditions; authorizing a county board or nonpublic school to take certain actions within the 60-day period regarding an emergent employee under certain circumstances; authorizing a certain appeal following a certain decision by a county board; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165262/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {165262/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM