Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Allowing Underage Drinker at Residence to Possess or Consume Alcohol - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Dumais, and A. Miller
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for specified violations of the prohibition against an adult knowingly and willfully allowing an individual under the age of 21 years to possess or consume an alcoholic beverage at a specified residence or within the curtilage of a specified residence; providing a penalty for a first offense of imprisonment not to exceed 1 year or a fine of up to $5,000 or both, or for a second or subsequent offense, maximum imprisonment of 2 years and a maximum fine of $7,500 or both; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-1)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Queen, Conaway and McComas)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Allowing Underage Drinker at Residence to Possess or Consume Alcohol - Penalties
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Allowing Underage Drinker at Residence to Possess or Consume Alcohol - Penalties
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (127-1) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {248073/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Queen, Conaway and McComas) 70
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116, 10-117, 10-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM