Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Alternative Schools – Reporting Requirements and Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegates D.M. Davis, Barron, Boyce, Cain, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Dumais, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Harrison, Ivey, R. Lewis, Lierman, Mosby, Patterson, Proctor, Queen, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2020-2021 school year, to report certain data and information for each alternative school within its jurisdiction to the State Department of Education; requiring the Department, on or before October 1 each year, beginning in 2021, to report to the Governor and the General Assembly the data and information required to be reported by the county boards; prohibiting the required enrollment of certain students from public schools in an alternative school, with a certain exception; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0830
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Alternative Schools - Reporting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Alternative Schools - Reporting Requirements
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {355863/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Education – Alternative Schools – Reporting Requirements and Restrictions
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 1:50 PM