Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture, in coordination with the Department of Natural Resources, to establish a certain program to address the illegal use of carbofuran and to eliminate stockpiles of carbofuran in the State; prohibiting a person from possessing or storing any quantity of carbofuran in the State on or after January 1, 2024; authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture, the Secretary of Natural Resources, or a Natural Resources police officer to seize any quantity of carbofuran for enforcement purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   5-2B-01 through 5-2B-04 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page