Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr and Feldmark
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "economic development program" for purposes of the data collection, tracking, and reporting requirements of the Maryland Jobs Development Act to include certain tax credit programs; and requiring the Department of Commerce, on or before December 31, 2020, to make available on the Department's website, in a certain format certain information relating to the recipients of economic development program tax credits or financial assistance and to update that information annually.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Text - Chapter - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:42 PM